NE LB1103 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to innovative tourism grants under the Nebraska Visitors Development Act
Title
Change provisions relating to innovative tourism grants under the Nebraska Visitors Development Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2024 |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2024-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |