NE LB1155 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1155 amended into LB866 by AM3356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1155 amended into LB866 by AM3356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Act and transfer funds from the General Fund
Title
Adopt the Middle Income Workforce Housing Investment Act and transfer funds from the General Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1155 amended into LB866 by AM3356 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Vargas AM2754 pending |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Vargas AM2754 filed |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2482 pending |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Motion to overrule the Chair withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Chair ruled AM2691 is not germane |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2482 pending |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Wishart name added |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM2691 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2482 filed |
2020-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2482 |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Legislature's Planning Committee priority bill |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2020 |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41599 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1155.pdf |