NE LB1158 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide requirements for medical assistance behavioral health managed care contracts
Title
Provide requirements for medical assistance behavioral health managed care contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 | |
2012-04-03 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-04-03 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-04-03 | Enrollment and Review ER271 adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Enrollment and Review ER271 filed | |
2012-04-02 | Placed on Select File with ER271 | |
2012-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-03-29 | Bloomfield AM2590 adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Hadley AM2551 adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Krist AM2521 adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Krist AM2418 withdrawn | |
2012-03-29 | Krist AM1909 withdrawn | |
2012-03-29 | Health and Human Services AM1936 adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Bloomfield AM2590 filed | |
2012-03-19 | Hadley AM2551 filed | |
2012-03-19 | Krist AM2521 filed | |
2012-03-14 | Krist AM2418 filed | |
2012-02-24 | Krist AM1909 filed | |
2012-02-22 | Health and Human Services AM1936 filed | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on General File with AM1936 | |
2012-02-21 | Speaker priority bill | |
2012-01-24 | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2012 | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Date of introduction |