NE LB1180 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to standards established by the Public Service Commission for specialized telecommunications equipment under the Telecommunications Relay System Act
Title
Change provisions relating to standards established by the Public Service Commission for specialized telecommunications equipment under the Telecommunications Relay System Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2024 |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2024-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |