NE LB1189 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Firefighter Cancer Benefits Act and provide an income tax exemption for such benefits
Title
Adopt the Firefighter Cancer Benefits Act and provide an income tax exemption for such benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41492 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1189.pdf |