NE LB1198 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - Attorney General Opinion 20-007 to Lathrop
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - Attorney General Opinion 20-007 to Lathrop
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds for the Governor's Emergency Program - COVID-19
Title
Appropriate funds for the Governor's Emergency Program - COVID-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-25 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - Legislature - Scheer MO177 prevailed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-23 - Legislature - Stinner AM2976 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Lathrop AM2844 lost (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-25 - Legislature - Scheer MO177 prevailed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-23 - Legislature - Stinner AM2976 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Legislature - Lathrop AM2844 lost (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Attorney General Opinion 20-007 to Lathrop |
2020-03-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 25, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 25, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Legislature | Hilkemann explanation of vote |
2020-03-25 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-03-25 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2020-03-25 | Legislature | Scheer MO177 prevailed |
2020-03-25 | Legislature | Scheer MO177 Permit the bill to be read on Final Reading prior to the 45th legislative day filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST52 |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Stinner AM2976 adopted |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Stinner AM2976 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Slama AM2842 withdrawn |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Slama AM2842 refiled |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2844 lost |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Slama AM2842 withdrawn |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2844 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Slama AM2842 filed |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Appropriations priority bill |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2020 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |