NE LB1377 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements relating to training for certain school employees
Title
Change requirements relating to training for certain school employees
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Education AM2861 filed |
2024-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2861 |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Walz AM2132 filed |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |