NE LB1378 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State legislative intent to appropriate funds to the Department of Administrative Services as prescribed and change provisions relating to certain funds
Title
State legislative intent to appropriate funds to the Department of Administrative Services as prescribed and change provisions relating to certain funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |