NE LB1387 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to approval and regulation of adding fluoride to the water supply of certain political subdivisions
Title
Change provisions relating to approval and regulation of adding fluoride to the water supply of certain political subdivisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |