NE LB145 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions governing active executive officers of banks and provide the Department of Banking and Finance with certain powers
Title
Change provisions governing active executive officers of banks and provide the Department of Banking and Finance with certain powers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 20, 2015 |
2015-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2015-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |