NE LB156 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the operation, titling, and registration of former military vehicles
Title
Provide for the operation, titling, and registration of former military vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM19 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM19 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER36 adopted |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER36 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER36 |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM19 adopted |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM19 filed |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM19 |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Erdman name added |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Lowe name added |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |