NE LB310 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change procedures for tax credits under the Nebraska Job Creation and Mainstreet Revitalization Act
Title
Change procedures for tax credits under the Nebraska Job Creation and Mainstreet Revitalization Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Legislature - Vargas AM2306 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Legislature - Vargas AM2099 adopted (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Legislature - Revenue AM739 adopted (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Legislature - Vargas AM2306 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Legislature - Vargas AM2099 adopted (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Legislature - Revenue AM739 adopted (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 13, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Vargas AM2306 adopted |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Vargas AM2306 filed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER155 adopted |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER155 filed |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER155 |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Vargas AM2099 adopted |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Revenue AM739 adopted |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Vargas AM2099 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Revenue AM739 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM739 |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |