NE LB344 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide natural resources districts with the power to issue general obligation bonds
Title
Provide natural resources districts with the power to issue general obligation bonds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kolowski MO196 approved |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kolowski MO196 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 20, 2016 filed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kintner FA92 pending |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kintner FA92 filed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Schnoor AM2446 pending |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Schnoor AM2446 filed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2112 adopted |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kolowski AM2415 adopted |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Kolowski AM2415 filed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | McCoy AM2403 lost |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | McCoy AM2403 pending |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | McCoy AM2403 pending |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | McCoy AM2403 filed |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2112 pending |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Schnoor MO195 withdrawn |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Schnoor MO195 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2112 filed |
2016-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2112 |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Kolowski priority bill |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |