NE LB35 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to reemployment, reinstatement, repayment, and age eligibility for certain members under the County Employees Retirement Act and State Employees Retirement Act
Title
Change provisions relating to reemployment, reinstatement, repayment, and age eligibility for certain members under the County Employees Retirement Act and State Employees Retirement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB35 amended into LB34 by AM591 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37563 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB35.pdf |