NE LB354A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-03-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |