NE LB370 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for an amendment to the medicaid state plan relating to dyslexia treatment
Title
Provide for an amendment to the medicaid state plan relating to dyslexia treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Merv Riepe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |