NE LB425 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to real estate tracts and the designation of industrial areas
Title
Change provisions relating to real estate tracts and the designation of industrial areas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-03 | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2011 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12449 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB425.pdf |