NE LB447 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change penalty provisions relating to criminal conspiracy and certain drug-related offenses
Title
Change penalty provisions relating to criminal conspiracy and certain drug-related offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-03-21 | Legislature | Halloran AM700 filed |
2017-03-21 | Legislature | Brewer AM702 filed |
2017-03-21 | Legislature | Geist AM699 filed |
2017-03-21 | Legislature | Albrecht AM701 filed |
2017-03-14 | Legislature | Halloran AM608 filed |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER17 filed |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER17 |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Linehan AM546 adopted |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Linehan AM546 filed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Larson MO52 failed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Larson MO52 pending |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Larson MO52 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Chambers FA42 withdrawn |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Larson MO51 withdrawn |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Larson MO51 Bracket until January 3, 2018 filed |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers FA42 pending |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers FA42 pending |
2017-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers FA42 filed |
2017-03-03 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Chambers priority bill |
2017-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-13 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30937 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB447.pdf |