NE LB465 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Electronic Notary Public Act
Title
Adopt the Electronic Notary Public Act
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER222 adopted |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER222 filed |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER222 |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Harr AM2628 adopted |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM802 adopted |
2016-03-17 | Legislature | Harr AM2628 filed |
2016-02-22 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM802 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM802 |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2015 |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |