NE LB467 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to State Patrol retirement
Title
Change provisions relating to State Patrol retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER187 adopted |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER187 filed |
2016-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER187 |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1865 withdrawn |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2351 adopted |
2016-03-08 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2351 pending |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2351 filed |
2016-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2351 |
2016-02-11 | Legislature | Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 4, 2016, on AM1865 |
2016-01-22 | Legislature | Kolterman AM1865 filed |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2016-01-21 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2015 |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |