NE LB474 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to claims against the state for wrongful incarceration and conviction
Title
Change provisions relating to claims against the state for wrongful incarceration and conviction
Sponsors
Sen. Myron Dorn [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37105 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB474.pdf |