NE LB475 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Education Formula and terminate the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Education Formula and terminate the Tax Equity and Educational Opportunities Support Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |