NE LB535 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Public Service Commission with exclusive jurisdiction over depth requirements for underground oil and natural gas pipelines
Title
Provide the Public Service Commission with exclusive jurisdiction over depth requirements for underground oil and natural gas pipelines
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Smith [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 10, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |