NE LB544 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB544 amended into LB610 by AM1771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB544 amended into LB610 by AM1771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Meadowlark Scholarship Act
Title
Adopt the Meadowlark Scholarship Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB544 amended into LB610 by AM1771 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Education AM1450 filed |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1450 |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37472 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB544.pdf |