NE LB596 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt equine, cat, and dog massage practice from licensure and regulation
Title
Exempt equine, cat, and dog massage practice from licensure and regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST55 |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Kuehn AM2523 adopted |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Chambers AM2578 adopted |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER136 adopted |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Kuehn AM2523 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Chambers AM2578 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER136 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER136 |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Groene AM2315 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM621 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Kuehn FA112 withdrawn |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Groene AM1500 withdrawn |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO273 withdrawn |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO273 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Chambers MO239 withdrawn |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Groene AM2315 filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers MO239 pending |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM621 pending |
2018-03-01 | Legislature | Chambers MO239 Bracket until April 4, 2018 filed |
2018-03-01 | Legislature | Kuehn FA112 filed |
2018-03-01 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM621 pending |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Groene AM1500 filed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM621 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM621 |
2017-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2017 |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |