NE LB607 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB335 amended into LB607 by AM1551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB335 amended into LB607 by AM1551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to aid to dependent children and create the Intergenerational Poverty Task Force
Title
Change provisions relating to aid to dependent children and create the Intergenerational Poverty Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB335 amended into LB607 by AM1551 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB89 amended into LB607 by AM1551 |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER129 adopted |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER129 filed |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER129 |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Campbell AM1551 adopted |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM782 lost |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Campbell AM1551 filed |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM782 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM782 |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |