NE LB64 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change and eliminate licensing, training, and internship provisions under the Licensing of Truth and Deception Examiners Act
Title
Change and eliminate licensing, training, and internship provisions under the Licensing of Truth and Deception Examiners Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37061 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB64.pdf |