NE LB643 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Abandoned Mobile Home Act and change provisions relating to abandoned vehicles
Title
Adopt the Abandoned Mobile Home Act and change provisions relating to abandoned vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 09, 2023 |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |