NE LB649 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Judiciary Committee to develop legislative recommendations for guardians ad litem for children and youth
Title
Require the Judiciary Committee to develop legislative recommendations for guardians ad litem for children and youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-02-01 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12826 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB649.pdf |