NE LB660 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the executive director and chief investigator of the Nebraska Brand Committee
Title
Change provisions relating to the executive director and chief investigator of the Nebraska Brand Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | M. Hansen explanation of vote |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER38 adopted |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER38 filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER38 |
2019-02-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |