NE LB679 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for new judges and members of the Nebraska State Patrol to become members of the State Employees Retirement System of the State of Nebraska
Title
Provide for new judges and members of the Nebraska State Patrol to become members of the State Employees Retirement System of the State of Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-01-26 | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12530 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB679.pdf |