NE LB682 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Sewer Infrastructure Assistance Act
Title
Adopt the Sewer Infrastructure Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-04-27 | Mello MO44 Unanimous consent approved | |
2011-04-27 | Mello MO44 Unanimous consent to bracket until January 4, 2012 filed | |
2011-04-26 | Mello MO41 Bracket until January 4, 2012 filed | |
2011-04-08 | Enrollment and Review ER82 filed | |
2011-04-08 | Placed on Select File with ER82 | |
2011-04-07 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-04-07 | Revenue AM626 adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Revenue AM626 pending | |
2011-04-06 | Mello AM1012 adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Mello AM1012 pending | |
2011-04-05 | Revenue AM626 pending | |
2011-03-30 | Mello AM1012 filed | |
2011-03-14 | Revenue AM626 filed | |
2011-03-14 | Placed on General File with AM626 | |
2011-03-10 | Mello priority bill | |
2011-02-09 | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Howard name added | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12423 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB682.pdf |