NE LB698 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change labeling requirements for alcohol-blended fuel
Title
Change labeling requirements for alcohol-blended fuel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover bill | |
2011-04-13 | Laid over | |
2011-04-13 | Christensen MO29 pending | |
2011-04-13 | Christensen MO29 Indefinitely postpone filed | |
2011-04-13 | Lautenbaugh MO28 withdrawn | |
2011-04-13 | Lautenbaugh MO28 Bracket until June 8, 2011 filed | |
2011-04-13 | Carlson AM1002 withdrawn | |
2011-04-13 | Carlson AM1002 pending | |
2011-04-13 | Langemeier AM907 withdrawn | |
2011-04-13 | Enrollment and Review ER58 adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Carlson AM1002 filed | |
2011-03-25 | Enrollment and Review ER58 filed | |
2011-03-25 | Placed on Select File with ER58 | |
2011-03-22 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-03-22 | Langemeier AM907 refiled | |
2011-03-22 | Langemeier AM907 withdrawn | |
2011-03-22 | Langemeier AM907 filed | |
2011-03-22 | Agriculture AM650 adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Carlson priority bill | |
2011-03-10 | Agriculture AM650 filed | |
2011-03-10 | Placed on General File with AM650 | |
2011-01-31 | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2011 | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Agriculture Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12707 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB698.pdf |