NE LB709 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Adopt the Small Business Regulatory Flexibility Act
Title
Adopt the Small Business Regulatory Flexibility Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-24 | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-23 | Business and Labor AM1824 adopted | |
2010-03-10 | Business and Labor AM1824 filed | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on General File with AM1824 | |
2010-02-19 | Giese name added | |
2010-02-19 | Giese priority bill | |
2010-01-27 | Conrad name added | |
2010-01-25 | Mello name added | |
2010-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Business and Labor Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9290 |