NE LB713 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide requirements for and prevent the prohibition of the installation of solar energy systems
Title
Provide requirements for and prevent the prohibition of the installation of solar energy systems
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Haar [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-11 | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2012 | |
2012-01-06 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-01-04 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15103 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB713.pdf |