NE LB728 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-06 - Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010
Summary
Adopt the Exploited Children's Civil Remedy Act and redefine a term with respect to pleas
Title
Adopt the Exploited Children's Civil Remedy Act and redefine a term with respect to pleas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Krist explanation of vote | |
2010-03-30 | Presented to Governor on March 30, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-03-30 | Passed on Final Reading 47-1-1 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-24 | Lautenbaugh AM2223 adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Enrollment and Review ER8194 adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Lautenbaugh AM2223 filed | |
2010-03-15 | Enrollment and Review ER8194 filed | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Select File with ER8194 | |
2010-03-12 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-12 | Lautenbaugh AM2157 adopted | |
2010-03-12 | Lautenbaugh AM2157 filed | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on General File | |
2010-02-19 | Langemeier priority bill | |
2010-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9595 |