NE LB730 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB730 amended into LB888 by AM2041
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB730 amended into LB888 by AM2041
Summary
Change provisions relating to charging orders and interests in limited liability companies
Title
Change provisions relating to charging orders and interests in limited liability companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB730 amended into LB888 by AM2041 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-04 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1749 filed | |
2010-02-04 | Placed on General File with AM1749 | |
2010-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9749 |