NE LB75 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Communication
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for restoration of voting rights upon completion of a felony sentence or probation for a felony
Title
Provide for restoration of voting rights upon completion of a felony sentence or probation for a felony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Failed to become law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor 23-23-3 (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Failed to become law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor 23-23-3 (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 27-13-9 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 27-13-9 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Failed to become law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor 23-23-3 (Y: 23 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 27-13-9 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 27-13-9 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Communication |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Larson MO125 withdrawn |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Larson MO125 Reconsider the vote on MO115 filed |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Failed to become law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor 23-23-3 |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Wayne MO115 failed |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Wayne MO115 Becomes law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor filed |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 27-13-9 |
2017-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-04-03 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Wayne priority bill |
2017-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |