NE LB755 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change rules for operation of all-terrain vehicles and utility-type vehicles
Title
Change rules for operation of all-terrain vehicles and utility-type vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Brewer AM1901 filed |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34316 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB755.pdf |