NE LB772 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Change and provide penalties for driving on a revoked license as prescribed
Title
Change and provide penalties for driving on a revoked license as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on General File | |
2010-02-01 | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee | |
2010-01-07 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9591 |