NE LB792 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB792 amended into LB791 by AM2708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB792 amended into LB791 by AM2708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change powers and duties of the Nebraska State Patrol, law enforcement agencies, the executive director of the Nebraska Commission on Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice, and the Attorney General
Title
Change powers and duties of the Nebraska State Patrol, law enforcement agencies, the executive director of the Nebraska Commission on Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice, and the Attorney General
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Ebke [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB792 amended into LB791 by AM2708 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-02 | Legislature | Chambers name added |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2018 (cancel) |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34372 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB792.pdf |