NE LB802 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Change revenue and taxation provisions to redefine contractor or repairperson and gross receipts to exclude sod as prescribed
Title
Change revenue and taxation provisions to redefine contractor or repairperson and gross receipts to exclude sod as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2010-01-08 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9916 |