NE LB823 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminate metropolitan utilities districts on January 1, 2015
Title
Terminate metropolitan utilities districts on January 1, 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2014 (cancel) |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | McGill MO136 prevailed |
2014-02-07 | Legislature | McGill MO136 Permit the Urban Affairs Committee to cancel the hearing scheduled for February 11, 2014 filed |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2014 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21861 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB823.pdf |