NE LB825 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to budgets and public hearing notice for certain governmental entities
Title
Change provisions relating to budgets and public hearing notice for certain governmental entities
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2287 filed |
2018-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2287 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 17, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34085 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB825.pdf |