NE LB828 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB828 amended into LB849 by AM2120
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB828 amended into LB849 by AM2120
Summary
Change requirements for medical radiographers and limited radiographers
Title
Change requirements for medical radiographers and limited radiographers
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gloor [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB828 amended into LB849 by AM2120 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-02-10 | Health and Human Services AM1732 filed | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on General File with AM1732 | |
2010-01-19 | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2010-01-08 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9562 |