NE LB836 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB836 amended into LB1158 by AM2851
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB836 amended into LB1158 by AM2851
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions governing certain contracts and agreements relating to the medical assistance program
Title
Change provisions governing certain contracts and agreements relating to the medical assistance program
Sponsors
Sen. John Arch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB836 amended into LB1158 by AM2851 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41139 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB836.pdf |