NE LB853 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB853 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB853 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize financial institutions to place a hold on certain customer transactions in cases of financial exploitation
Title
Authorize financial institutions to place a hold on certain customer transactions in cases of financial exploitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB853 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2271 filed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2271 |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | La Grone name added |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41033 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB853.pdf |