NE LB855 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB855 amended into LB1132 by AM2361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB855 amended into LB1132 by AM2361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Security, Privacy, and Dissemination of Criminal History Information Act provisions to provide for charges or offenses that have been pardoned
Title
Change Security, Privacy, and Dissemination of Criminal History Information Act provisions to provide for charges or offenses that have been pardoned
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB855 amended into LB1132 by AM2361 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Thibodeau name added |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1780 filed |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1780 |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34068 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB855.pdf |