NE LB864 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2010
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 07, 2010
Summary
Provide, change, and eliminate duties for the Community Corrections Council
Title
Provide, change, and eliminate duties for the Community Corrections Council
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Pirsch [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Approved by Governor on April 07, 2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Presented to Governor on April 01, 2010 | |
2010-04-01 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-01 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-24 | Pirsch AM2208 adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Enrollment and Review ER8197 adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Pirsch AM2208 filed | |
2010-03-15 | Enrollment and Review ER8197 filed | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Select File with ER8197 | |
2010-03-12 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-12 | Judiciary AM1679 adopted | |
2010-03-09 | Judiciary AM1679 filed | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on General File with AM1679 | |
2010-02-22 | Speaker priority bill | |
2010-01-21 | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2010 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9970 |