NE LB864 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB864 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB864 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designate funds appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services for state aid
Title
Designate funds appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services for state aid
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB864 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34472 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB864.pdf |